+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ358ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 985683297
+ − Vote
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (105)
Type:
Primary Sponsor