+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ351ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4791482 (HJ351H1)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor