+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ336ER)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (30-Y 10-N)
- Read second time
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 16104832D
- Unanimous consent to introduce