+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 14, 1994 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ291ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD4807136 (HJ291S1)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4792136 (HJ291H1)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed