+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ284ER)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ284ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (74-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 22-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989826252
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Rules (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 22-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor