+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ283ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 986986376-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/amd. (18-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986986376
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/amd. (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor