+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 16, 2001 in the House:
- Rejected by House (44-Y 51-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (44-Y 51-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 12, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 11, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On December 19, 2000 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 002659896
On December 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (17-Y 6-N)
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Continued to 2001 in P. & E. (20-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 002659896
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 16, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (44-Y 51-N)
December 11, 2000: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (17-Y 6-N)
February 13, 2000: Continued to 2001 in P. & E. (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor