+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ278ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 988985112-E
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988985112
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor