+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ276ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 981357443-H2
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute by voice vote
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Delegates: Scott, Callahan, Rollison
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 981357443
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senators: Houck, Barry, Wampler
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (4-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 96-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 989777443-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 989777443-S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 989777443-S1
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 989100443-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989100443-H1
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (26-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989100443-H1
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986389443
- Referred to Committee on Transportation