+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 13, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ269ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor