+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ264ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 981202324-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981202324-H1
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981202324-H1
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981967324
- Referred to Committee on Rules