+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ26ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor