+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ258ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD2345388 (HJ258S1)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor