+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ256ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Title replaced
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Sen. Gartlan agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD7030410 (HJ256E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. w/amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. w/amds. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor