+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ254ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986174260
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor