+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ251ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981172148
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor