+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ237ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendment # 4 reconsidered
- Amendment by Mr Cranwell withdrawn
- Amendment by Mr Reid agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 986377424-E
- Agreed to by House (90-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986377424
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 1-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor