+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ234ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986393466
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor