+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ228ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988924346
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology