+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ217ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Title replaced
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989550410-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 989550410-H1
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989550410-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 989255410