+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ215ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 981207198-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 981207198-S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 981207198-S1
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 981191825-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981191825-H1
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 981191825-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981972825
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor