+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ212ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 981358132-H1
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute by voice vote
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Houck, Gartlan, Marye
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Delegates: Bloxom, Spruill, Davis
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 981358132
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
- Senate substitute rejected by House (3-Y 91-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (3-Y 91-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Rules committee substitute rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Finance committee substitute agreed to 985465661-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985465661-S2
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985465661-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 981350132-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr Bloxom agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 989096260-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989096260
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions