+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 2, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ207ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Mr. Holland rejected
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961175146
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor