+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ200ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988636316-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988636316
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Agriculture w/amendments (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor