+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ196ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989074120
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor