+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 14, 1996 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 28, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ196ER)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 968089128-H2
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 968089128-H2
- Senate substitute with amendments rejected by conference committee
On March 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on sub. w/amds. by voice vote
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate sub. w/amds. rejected by House (11-Y 87-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (11-Y 87-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Holland, Houck, Barry
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Bennett, Diamonstein, McDonnell
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 964491128-S1
- Passed by temporarily
- Amendments by Mr. Barry agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Mr. Stolle agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub./w. amds. 964491128-ES1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute with amendments by voice vote
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964491128-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 968062128-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 968062128-H1
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 968062128-H1
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961802128
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (11-Y 87-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor