+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 981359320-H2
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute by voice vote
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Houck, Quayle, Reasor
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Keating, Murphy, Rhodes
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 981359320
- Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 4-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (8-Y 86-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (8-Y 86-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 981354685-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 981354685-S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 981354685-S1
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 981194320-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981194320-H1
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 981194320-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983233320
- Referred to Committee on Rules