+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ190ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 982886825-E
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982886825
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor