+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 10, 1994 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ19ER)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (9-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Rules (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor