+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ184ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Howell agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988533408
- Referred to Committee on General Laws