+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ180ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (27-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986019828
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (27-Y 3-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor