+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ178ER)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Discharged from Rules
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985706388
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor