+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ178ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent to introduce
- Presented and ordered printed 18105898D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor