+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ176ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Amendment by Mr. DeBoer agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982164128-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from S. T. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982164128
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from S. T. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor