+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ174ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981683416-E
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reconsidered by Conservation and Natural Resources
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. N. R. (16-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981683416
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in C. N. R. (16-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor