+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 20, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ163ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (20-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 006453804
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2000: Reported from Militia and Police (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor