+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ163ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (78-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 21-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981180196-E
- Agreed to by House (70-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 21-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 2-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981180196
- Referred to Committee on Education