+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ159ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
- Title replaced
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989042256-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989042256
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor