+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18101423D