+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ153ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 981351114-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 981351114-S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981351114-S1
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989513114-E
- Agreed to by House (86-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 11-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989513114
- Referred to Committee on Rules