+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ152ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 989576432-H1
- Amendment by Mr. Marshall rejected
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989576432-H1
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (17-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989576432-H1
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987152432
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor