+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ151ER)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18104219D
+ − Vote
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor