+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ150ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Substitute by Mr.Purkey agreed to 980516412-H1
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. 980516412-H1 (Purkey)
- Floor substitute printed 980516412-H1 (Purkey)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983122412
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor