+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ144ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105819D-H1
- Amendments by Delegate Keam agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HJ144EH1
- Printed as engrossed 18105819D-EH1
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105819D-H1
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105567D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor