+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ143ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 963435412-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 963435412