+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ142ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Hanger withdrawn
- Reading of amendment waived
- Pending question ordered (26-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION R (26-Y 8-N)
- Amendment #2 by Sen. Watkins rejected (15-Y 24-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 2 (15-Y 24-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments #3 & 4 by Sen. Mims rejected
- Agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO V (23-Y 15-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (24-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO V (24-Y 15-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 980852400-E
- Agreed to by House (93-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 980852400
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO V (24-Y 15-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 2 (15-Y 24-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO V (23-Y 15-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION R (26-Y 8-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor