+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ14ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/22/97 986564198
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor