+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ135ER)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 22103397D