+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ134ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (9-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982769346-E
- Agreed to by House (Viva Voce Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982769346
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendments (9-Y 6-N 1-A)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor