+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ130ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024216944